You can read about the people who make up our board of governors below. If you would like to read official governance documents relating to our school, you can visit our governance page under our ‘Key Info’ section:
GOVERNANCE DOCUMENTS
Our Governors are representatives of the local community, parents, school staff and the Local Education authority. They bring a range of interests knowledge and skills to the school whilst working in a voluntary capacity.
Governors’ Details
Ellen Smith – Headteacher
I’ve worked at Apley wood since 2012 as Deputy Headteacher and am now privileged to be Headteacher. I have been a Specialist Leader of Education in SEN and have experience of working closely with the Severn Teaching School Alliance to deliver support both within Telford and in other surrounding Local Authorities. I also work closely with Best Practice Network delivering training and assessments for Higher Level Teaching Assistants.
I am very proud to be Headteacher at Apley and I thoroughly enjoy working here. It is an exciting time to be a part of our school’s continuing success and achievements. It is a pleasure to work within such a happy environment with a great team of staff, governors, children and parents.
Yvonne Thorpe – Teaching Governor Term of office from 01/01/2020 to 01/01/2024 Appointed by teaching staff.
During my time at Apley Wood, I have taught from years 2 to year 6. I have also been an active member of the school leadership team and know the schools priorities and needs. I actively work with the rest of the SLT and other colleagues to ensure that actions to address our key priorities are addressed in order to continually move the school forward. I am committed to our vision and strive to ensure that everything I do centres around achieving the best possible outcomes for our children and equipping them with the skills they need for life. I am always willing to give my time to actively support our school and organise fundraising events and residential visits.
I am an SLE for the Severn Teaching Alliance and work closely with other schools in and around the county in order to help them with their development needs. I am also an NCETM maths PD lead and able to offer maths training in my own setting and other schools. I am a local authority English writing moderator.
Janette Harris – Co-opted Governor Term of office 04/02/2021 to 04/02/2025. Appointed by Governors.
I have I am a retired Headteacher and Consultant Headteacher for Telford and Wrekin with forty years’ experience in Education. In my retirement I enjoy volunteering for a charity and being a school governor. I have had the privilege to be a governor since 2014, a role I enjoy. My interest is supporting school self-evaluation to raise standards with high quality teaching and learning, rigorous monitoring, setting of targets and analysing data outcomes, ensuring that every child has access to a broad and balanced curriculum so that they can reach their true potential.
Peter Brown – Co-opted Governor Term of office 05/05/2021 – 05/05/2025. Appointed by Governors.
I am a senior electrical design engineer within Shropshire County Council. A member of the Institute of Engineering and Technology and a registered Incorporated Engineer.
Professional skills include building and facility design, maintenance, costing and projects, management of public buildings – mostly in schools.
Personal skills include compliance, problem solving, financial controls, future proofing and evaluation of new and emerging technologies.
Esther McDermott – Local Authority Governor Term of office 12/11/2020 to 12/11/2024. Appointed by Local Authority.
Chair of Governors
I have been Local Authority Governor at Apley Wood since 2008 and have since had two children who have both attended the school. I am passionate about Apley Wood Primary School as I have lived in the area for almost 20 years and feel we are very lucky to have such a vibrant and inspirational school for our children. It is a privilege for me to be a member of the governing board and to have been part of the school’s growth over the years.
I have worked for the Local Authority since 2004 and have undertaken various roles including senior support roles for School Improvement services and School Governance. I undertook a brief secondment to the Children’s Safeguarding Team in 2009 and I am also employed as a Local Authority Clerk to Governors at 7 other primary schools across Telford and Wrekin.
My substantive role with the Local Authority is now in education premises contract management, which draws on the skills and experience I gained whilst working in my previous support roles in education and more recently having worked in Facilities Management.
I have undertaken training with the Local Authority in Health and Safety, Risk Assessment and Management, Children’s Safeguarding, Child Protection, Safer Recruitment, PREVENT, Equality and Diversity, Customer Service and Governors role in SEN. I have also undertaken a professional qualification in school governance clerking and am trained to act as an Independent Review Panel member for exclusions.
Prior to joining the Local Authority I worked for several years in the Insurance, Life Assurance and Pensions industry.
Victoria Rodgers – Parent Governor Term of office 27/03/2023 to 27/03/2027.
I am an Education Welfare Officer within Shropshire County Council where I currently manage the attendance of pupils at multiple primary and secondary schools within Shropshire. I also have previous experience within the School nurse team in Telford and I have been a Level 3 Teaching Assistant in primary schools.
I am a parent to a Year 1 pupil here at Apley Wood and another child who is currently in Year 9 at secondary school.
I am DBS certified and commit to annual safeguarding and child protection training, in which I am passionate about and I look forward to joining the school Governing body and making positive change in my 4 year term.
Bhavna Mistry – Foundation Governor Term of office from 28/04/2023 to 28/04/2027. Appointed by Governors.
Vice Chair of Governors
I work in the IT Industry as a Solutions Engineering Manager at NetApp UK Ltd, responsible for European Partners across UK, Middle East and Iberia. I have an Honours Bachelors and Masters Degree in Electronics Engineering from the University of Warwick and have worked for 20 years in the IT industry in a technical role
I am enthusiastic and passionate about Women in IT and recently presented on my experiences from 20 years in the IT Industry at the European Women In Technology Conference in Amsterdam. I have two daughters currently at Apley Wood Primary School and am pleased at how the school has a passion for enabling children to learn new technologies, such as trying new skills like coding.
Claire Pritchard – Co-opted Governor Term of office 25/05/2023 to 24/05/2027 Appointed by Governors.
I have held a variety of roles within the administration side of the education sector since 2010 and currently work in the Human Resources department at a local private school. From September 2023 I will have two boys at Apley Wood Primary School and thought it would be the perfect time to get involved as a parent governor. Since my first child started at Apley Wood in 2019, I have been consistently impressed with the School and its principles. I am excited to be part of the Apley Wood Board and look forward to supporting the School in achieving its visions and aims.